CO HB1056 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-4)
Status: Passed on May 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-24 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-4)
Status: Passed on May 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-24 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning public projects supervised by the department of transportation that are subject to the "Construction Bidding for Public Projects Act".
Title
Cost Thresholds For Public Project Bidding Requirements
Sponsors
Sen. Rod Pelton [R] | Sen. Chris Hansen [D] | Rep. Matt Gray [D] | Rep. Edith Hooton [D] |
Rep. Mary Young [D] | Sen. Brittany Pettersen [D] | Rep. Shannon Bird [D] | Rep. Rod Bockenfeld [R] |
Rep. Marc Catlin [R] | Sen. Thomas Exum [D] | Rep. Cathy Kipp [D] | Rep. Andres Pico [R] |
Rep. Marc Snyder [D] | Rep. Steven Woodrow [D] | Sen. Pete Lee [D] | Sen. Dominick Moreno [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 25 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Refer House Bill 21-1056 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 56 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer House Bill 21-1056, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer House Bill 21-1056, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Refer House Bill 21-1056, as amended, to the Committee on Business Affairs & Labor. (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Refer House Bill 21-1056, as amended, to the Committee on Business Affairs & Labor. (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Refer House Bill 21-1056 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 56 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer House Bill 21-1056, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer House Bill 21-1056, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Refer House Bill 21-1056, as amended, to the Committee on Business Affairs & Labor. (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Refer House Bill 21-1056, as amended, to the Committee on Business Affairs & Labor. (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-24 | Governor Signed | |
2021-05-14 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2021-05-14 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-04-30 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Senate Committee on Transportation & Energy Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Transportation & Energy |
2021-04-12 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-04-09 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2021-04-07 | House | House Committee on Business Affairs & Labor Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2021-03-30 | House | House Committee on Transportation & Local Government Refer Amended to Business Affairs & Labor |
2021-02-16 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Local Government + Business Affairs & Labor |