CO HB1056 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-03 - Senate Committee on Appropriations Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-03 - Senate Committee on Appropriations Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Advanced Placement Incentives Pilot Program
Title
Advanced Placement Incentives Pilot Program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1056, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 2 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-05-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - PI The motion passed on a vote of 5-2. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - J.003 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-05-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1056, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 2 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-05-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - PI The motion passed on a vote of 5-2. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - J.003 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-05-01 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to amend the bill, page 3, line 17 after "of" insert "social studies," (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-05-01 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved severed amendment L.007 (Attachment C), page 1, lines 3-12 (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-01 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved severed amendment L.007 (Attachment C), page 1, lines 1-2 (Y: 4 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-05-01 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to amend amendment L.007 (Attachment C), page 1, line 9, strike "takes" and insert "scores a 3 or higher" (Y: 4 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-05-01 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 13-1056, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-01 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved amendment L.005 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-05-01 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to amend the bill, page 3, line 17 after "of" insert "social studies," (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-05-01 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved severed amendment L.007 (Attachment C), page 1, lines 3-12 (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-01 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved severed amendment L.007 (Attachment C), page 1, lines 1-2 (Y: 4 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-05-01 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to amend amendment L.007 (Attachment C), page 1, line 9, strike "takes" and insert "scores a 3 or higher" (Y: 4 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-05-01 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved amendment L.005 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-05-01 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 13-1056, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-01 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW - amended The motion passed on a vote of 10-3. (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-01 - House - FINAL VOTE - J.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-01 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW - amended The motion passed on a vote of 10-3. (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-01 - House - FINAL VOTE - J.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-01-28 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment J) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-01-28 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1056, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-28 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment J) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-01-28 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1056, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - PI The motion passed on a vote of 5-2. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - J.003 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-05-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1056, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 2 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-05-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - PI The motion passed on a vote of 5-2. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - J.003 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-05-01 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to amend the bill, page 3, line 17 after "of" insert "social studies," (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-05-01 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved severed amendment L.007 (Attachment C), page 1, lines 3-12 (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-01 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved severed amendment L.007 (Attachment C), page 1, lines 1-2 (Y: 4 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-05-01 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to amend amendment L.007 (Attachment C), page 1, line 9, strike "takes" and insert "scores a 3 or higher" (Y: 4 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-05-01 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 13-1056, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-01 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved amendment L.005 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-05-01 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to amend the bill, page 3, line 17 after "of" insert "social studies," (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-05-01 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved severed amendment L.007 (Attachment C), page 1, lines 3-12 (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-01 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved severed amendment L.007 (Attachment C), page 1, lines 1-2 (Y: 4 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-05-01 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to amend amendment L.007 (Attachment C), page 1, line 9, strike "takes" and insert "scores a 3 or higher" (Y: 4 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-05-01 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved amendment L.005 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-05-01 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 13-1056, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-01 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW - amended The motion passed on a vote of 10-3. (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-01 - House - FINAL VOTE - J.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-01 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW - amended The motion passed on a vote of 10-3. (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-01 - House - FINAL VOTE - J.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-01-28 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment J) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-01-28 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1056, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-28 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment J) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-01-28 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1056, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-03 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Postpone Indefinitely |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Senate Committee on Education Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Education |
2013-04-05 | House | House Third Reading Passed |
2013-04-03 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily |
2013-04-02 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-04-01 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2013-01-28 | House | House Committee on Education Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2013-01-09 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Education + Appropriations |