CO HB1055 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-17 - House Third Reading Laid Over to 03/03/2014 - No Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-17 - House Third Reading Laid Over to 03/03/2014 - No Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Legislative License Plates
Title
Legislative License Plates
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-06 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment B) (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-06 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1055, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-06 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment B) (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-06 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1055, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-06 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1055, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-06 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment B) (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-06 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1055, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-17 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over to 03/03/2014 - No Amendments |
2014-02-14 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2014-02-11 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2014-02-06 | House | House Committee on Transportation & Energy Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2014-01-08 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Energy |