CO HB1054 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-09 - House Third Reading Lost
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-09 - House Third Reading Lost
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Require RTD To Contract Bus Service
Title
Require RTD To Contract Bus Service
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1054 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1054 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1054 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1054 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1054 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-09 | House Third Reading Lost | |
2011-02-08 | House Second Reading Passed | |
2011-02-07 | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2011-02-02 | House Committee on Transportation Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole | |
2011-01-12 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation |