CO HB1052 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on March 10 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-03-23 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning restrictions on making public the personal information of certain employees at risk of threats relating to the administration of human services programs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Privacy Protections For Human Services Workers

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-10 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer House Bill 20-1052, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer House Bill 20-1052, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 20-1052, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 20-1052, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-23 Sent to the Governor
2020-03-17HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2020-03-17SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2020-03-10SenateHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2020-03-06SenateHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
2020-03-06SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-03-05SenateSenate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
2020-03-02SenateSenate Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2020-02-03SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary
2020-01-29HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-01-28HouseHouse Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
2020-01-23HouseHouse Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2020-01-08HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary

Subjects


Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb20-1052
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1052_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1052_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1052_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1052_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1052_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1052_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/059bf8dcd2242161872584f8007fcff0-hb20-1052-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/059bf8dcd2242161872584f8007fcff0-hb20-1052-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb20-1052vote5acff3
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/154afeb9ec3a6b1a8725851f007285d5-hb20-1052-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/154afeb9ec3a6b1a8725851f007285d5-hb20-1052-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb20-1052vote5a95d3
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb20-1052vote5751d8
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb20-1052vote576311

Bill Comments

feedback