CO HB1052 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-16 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-16 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning factors to take into consideration in determining the child welfare allocation formula in a given fiscal year.
Title
Child Welfare Allocation Formula Factors
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 17-1052 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Refer House Bill 17-1052 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 17-1052 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Refer House Bill 17-1052 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-16 | Governor Signed | |
2017-03-08 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2017-03-06 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services |
2017-02-06 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-02-03 | House | House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-01-31 | House | House Committee on Public Health Care & Human Services Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2017-01-11 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Public Health Care & Human Services |