CO HB1050 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-09 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-09 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Boiler Inspection Regulation
Title
Boiler Inspection Regulation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-14 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1050 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1050 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1050 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-01-27 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1050 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-01-27 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1050 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-01-27 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1050 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1050 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1050 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-01-27 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1050 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-01-27 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1050 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-01-27 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1050 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-09 | Governor Action - Signed | |
2011-02-28 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-02-28 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2011-02-24 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | |
2011-02-18 | Senate Third Reading Passed | |
2011-02-17 | Senate Second Reading Passed | |
2011-02-14 | Senate Committee on Business, Labor and Technology Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole | |
2011-02-03 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor and Technology | |
2011-02-03 | House Third Reading Passed | |
2011-02-02 | House Second Reading Passed | |
2011-02-01 | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2011-01-27 | House Committee on Economic and Business Development Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole | |
2011-01-18 | House Committee on Economic and Business Development Lay Over Unamended - Amendment(s) Failed | |
2011-01-12 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Economic and Business Development |