CO HB1049 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-12 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-12 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the department of human services' authority to continue to lease portions of the Grand Junction regional center campus to third-party behavioral health providers.
Title
DHS Department of Human Services Authority To Lease Grand Junction Regional Center
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1049 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 18-1049 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1049 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 18-1049, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 18-1049, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Refer House Bill 18-1049 to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1049 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 18-1049 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1049 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 18-1049, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 18-1049, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Refer House Bill 18-1049 to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-12 | Governor Signed | |
2018-04-11 | Sent to the Governor | |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2018-04-10 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance |
2018-02-27 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-02-26 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2018-02-23 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2018-01-29 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2018-01-23 | House | House Committee on Public Health Care & Human Services Refer Unamended to Finance |
2018-01-10 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Public Health Care & Human Services |