CO HB1048 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 17-2)
Status: Engrossed on May 16 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-16 - Introduced In Senate - Assigned to
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the creation of the "In God We Trust" license plate, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In God We Trust Special License Plate

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-05-11 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 39 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 22-1048, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 22-1048, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 22-1048 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-05-16SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to
2022-05-11HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2022-05-10HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
2022-05-09HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2022-02-17HouseHouse Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2022-01-12HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Finance

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb22-1048
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2022A/bills/2022a_1048_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2022A/bills/2022a_1048_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2022A/bills/2022a_1048_ren.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2022A/amendments/HB1048_J.001.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2022A/amendments/HB1048_L.002.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2022A/bills/fn/2022a_hb1048_00.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2022A/bills/fn/2022a_hb1048_hse.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2022A/bills/fn/2022a_hb1048_f1.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/0c66b24b9e9c2a7b872587ec006a5aed-hb22-1048-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/3c6134848cadc3998725883d0079cf9a-hb22-1048-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/3c6134848cadc3998725883d0079cf9a-hb22-1048-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb22-1048vote6e0e41

Bill Comments

feedback