CO HB1048 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-06 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning a prohibition against discrimination based on a person's traits that are historically associated with race.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Race Trait Hairstyle Anti-discrimination Protect

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 23 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 20-1048 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 42 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer House Bill 20-1048 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-06 Governor Signed
2020-03-06 Sent to the Governor
2020-03-05SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2020-03-05HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2020-03-03HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-02-28SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-02-27SenateSenate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-02-24SenateSenate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2020-02-13SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs
2020-02-11HouseHouse Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2020-02-10HouseHouse Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor
2020-02-05HouseHouse Committee on Business Affairs & Labor Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2020-01-08HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs & Labor

Subjects


Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb20-1048
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1048_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1048_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1048_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1048_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1048_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1048_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/33efc803b53f8781872585050070c61f-hb20-1048-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb20-1048vote5a3703
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/c0cac9cfa802e046872585180072094f-hb20-1048-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb20-1048vote5dd8a2

Bill Comments

feedback