CO HB1048 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-03 - House Committee on Appropriations Committee Vote - Final Action Failed
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-03 - House Committee on Appropriations Committee Vote - Final Action Failed
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Income Tax Credits For Nonpublic Ed
Title
Income Tax Credits For Nonpublic Ed
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - HB 11-1048 be laid over until July 4, 2011 (Y: 6 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-05-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - HB 11-1048 be laid over until July 4, 2011 (Y: 6 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-05-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - HB 11-1048 be laid over until July 4, 2011 (Y: 6 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-03-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1048, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1048, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1048, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-07 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1048 to the Committee on Finance (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-07 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1048 to the Committee on Finance (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-07 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1048 to the Committee on Finance (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - HB 11-1048 be laid over until July 4, 2011 (Y: 6 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-05-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - HB 11-1048 be laid over until July 4, 2011 (Y: 6 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-03-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1048, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1048, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1048, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-07 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1048 to the Committee on Finance (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-07 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1048 to the Committee on Finance (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-07 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1048 to the Committee on Finance (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-03 | House Committee on Appropriations Committee Vote - Final Action Failed | |
2011-03-03 | House Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations | |
2011-02-09 | House Committee on Finance Witness Testimony and/or Committee Discussion Only | |
2011-02-07 | House Committee on Education Refer Unamended to Finance | |
2011-01-12 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Education + Finance + Appropriations |