CO HB1041 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-07 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-07 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning adding certified police working horses to the crime of cruelty to a service animal or a certified police working dog.
Title
Crime Of Cruelty To Certified Police Working Horse
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Refer House Bill 18-1041 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 18-1041 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Refer House Bill 18-1041 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 18-1041 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-07 | Governor Signed | |
2018-03-02 | Sent to the Governor | |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2018-03-01 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Senate Committee on Local Government Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Local Government |
2018-02-08 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-02-07 | House | House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-02-06 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over to 02/07/2018 - No Amendments |
2018-02-01 | House | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2018-01-10 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary |