CO HB1039 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-19 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Moneys Credited To Legislative Dept Cash Fund

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Moneys Credited To Legislative Dept Cash Fund

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-04-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW to consent The motion passed on a vote of 7-0. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW to consent The motion passed on a vote of 7-0. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-28 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1039 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-28 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1039 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-01 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW - unamended The motion passed on a vote of 12-0. (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-01 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW - unamended The motion passed on a vote of 12-0. (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-01-16 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved Amendment L.002 (Attachment F) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-01-16 - House - FINAL VOTE - L.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-01-16 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1039, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-01-16 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved Amendment L.001 (Attachment E) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-01-16 - House - FINAL VOTE - L.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-01-16 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved Amendment L.002 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-01-16 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1039, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-01-16 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved Amendment L.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-04-19HouseGovernor Action - Signed
2013-04-11HouseSent to the Governor
2013-04-09SenateSenate Third Reading Passed
2013-04-08SenateSenate Second Reading Special Order - Passed
2013-04-05SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2013-02-28SenateSenate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2013-02-08SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance + Appropriations
2013-02-05HouseHouse Third Reading Passed
2013-02-04HouseHouse Second Reading Passed with Amendments
2013-02-01HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2013-01-16HouseHouse Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations
2013-01-09HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Finance

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/D56229177FCCA6F287257AEE00585262?Open
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/D56229177FCCA6F287257AEE00585262/$FILE/1039_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/D56229177FCCA6F287257AEE00585262/$FILE/1039-fin_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/D56229177FCCA6F287257AEE00585262/$FILE/1039_eng.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/D56229177FCCA6F287257AEE00585262/$FILE/1039_ren.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/D56229177FCCA6F287257AEE00585262/$FILE/1039_rev.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/D56229177FCCA6F287257AEE00585262/$FILE/1039_rer.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/D56229177FCCA6F287257AEE00585262/$FILE/1039_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/A1EE378445DA2EC087257AF50076B0CE
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/9A760AE9B59EF4CD87257AF50077120B
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/65E545084347CF4887257AF50076D0A5
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/8539CC5C94E7320887257AF50076FA27
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/BF4EEC89EEA1154787257B0500536088
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/92E528E4AE85965F87257B20005F0584
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/5AEE4562C015577187257B44004F2767
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2013A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/A1EE378445DA2EC087257AF50076B0CE
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2013A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/9A760AE9B59EF4CD87257AF50077120B
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2013A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/8539CC5C94E7320887257AF50076FA27
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2013A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/65E545084347CF4887257AF50076D0A5
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2013A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/BF4EEC89EEA1154787257B0500536088
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2013A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/92E528E4AE85965F87257B20005F0584
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2013A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/5AEE4562C015577187257B44004F2767

Bill Comments

feedback