CO HB1037 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on April 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - Senate Committee on Transportation & Energy Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning energy asset management, and, in connection therewith, authorizing the issuance of low-cost ratepayer-backed bonds and creating the Colorado energy impact assistance authority to mitigate the impacts of power plant retirements on Colorado workers and communities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Colorado Energy Impact Assistance Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-25 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Postpone House Bill 19-1037 indefinitely. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - Senate - Senate Agriculture & Natural Resources: Refer House Bill 19-1037, as amended, to the Committee on Transportation & Energy. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - Senate - Senate Agriculture & Natural Resources: Refer House Bill 19-1037, as amended, to the Committee on Transportation & Energy. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 40 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House Energy & Environment: Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment J) (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House Energy & Environment: Refer House Bill 19-1037, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House Energy & Environment: Refer House Bill 19-1037, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-25SenateSenate Committee on Transportation & Energy Postpone Indefinitely
2019-04-18SenateSenate Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources Refer Amended to Transportation & Energy
2019-03-07SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture & Natural Resources
2019-03-04HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-03-01HouseHouse Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2019-02-28HouseHouse Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
2019-02-26HouseHouse Second Reading Laid Over to 02/28/2019 - No Amendments
2019-02-20HouseHouse Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2019-02-19HouseHouse Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2019-02-15HouseHouse Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2019-02-14HouseHouse Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2019-02-11HouseHouse Committee on Energy & Environment Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2019-01-04HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Energy & Environment

Subjects


Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb19-1037
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1037_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1037_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1037_ren.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/4a65bc1ddf2f4ad68725839e0070ddf8-hb19-1037-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/4a65bc1ddf2f4ad68725839e0070ddf8-hb19-1037-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/4a65bc1ddf2f4ad68725839e0070ddf8-hb19-1037-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1037vote5ff573
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/a5a1f16c61ee51ef872583e0007517ea-hb19-1037-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/a5a1f16c61ee51ef872583e0007517ea-hb19-1037-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/4ba3596235adc2e3872583e700686fb2-hb19-1037-0-activity-vote-summary

Bill Comments

feedback