CO HB1032 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-20 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Licensed Mental Health Professionals Treat Minors

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Licensed Mental Health Professionals Treat Minors

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-03-04 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1032 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-27 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-01-27 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1032, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-27 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-01-27 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1032, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-20HouseGovernor Signed
2015-03-16HouseSent to the Governor
2015-03-13HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2015-03-13HouseSigned by the President of the Senate
2015-03-11SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2015-03-10SenateSenate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
2015-03-04SenateSenate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2015-02-17SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services
2015-02-06HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2015-02-05HouseHouse Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
2015-01-27HouseHouse Committee on Public Health Care & Human Services Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2015-01-07HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Public Health Care & Human Services

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/4E70BD0DDEB0065F87257DA200626743?Open
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/4E70BD0DDEB0065F87257DA200626743/$FILE/1032_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/4E70BD0DDEB0065F87257DA200626743/$FILE/1032pubhe_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/4E70BD0DDEB0065F87257DA200626743/$FILE/1032_eng.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/4E70BD0DDEB0065F87257DA200626743/$FILE/1032_ren.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/4E70BD0DDEB0065F87257DA200626743/$FILE/1032_rev.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/4E70BD0DDEB0065F87257DA200626743/$FILE/1032_rer.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/4E70BD0DDEB0065F87257DA200626743/$FILE/1032_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2015A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/E7D6169C19C1A0EF87257DDA0076B6BA
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2015A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/E7BA1FAF5006197C87257DDA0076A4DE
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/E7D6169C19C1A0EF87257DDA0076B6BA
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/E7BA1FAF5006197C87257DDA0076A4DE
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/C4326B0C2A6E5D7E87257DFE0061F264

Bill Comments

feedback