CO HB1025 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-28 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the timing of an inquiry into a job applicant's criminal history, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Limits On Job Applicant Criminal History Inquiries

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 20 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 22 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 20 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1025 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer House Bill 19-1025 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 42 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.009) (Y: 29 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-26 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.008) (Y: 22 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-02-22 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1025, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1025, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-01-29 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-01-29 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.004 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-01-29 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 19-1025, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 19-1025, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-28 Governor Signed
2019-04-29 Sent to the Governor
2019-04-29SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-04-29HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2019-04-12SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-04-12SenateSenate Third Reading Reconsidered - No Amendments
2019-04-12SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-04-12SenateSenate Third Reading Reconsidered - No Amendments
2019-04-12SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-04-11SenateSenate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-04-09SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2019-03-18SenateSenate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2019-03-01SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary
2019-02-28HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-02-26HouseHouse Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
2019-02-22HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2019-01-29HouseHouse Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Appropriations
2019-01-04HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb19-1025
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1025_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1025_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1025_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1025_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1025_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1025_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/157ea5a113c2ad148725839100787648-hb19-1025-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/7b82f1a30843e13b872583a90052967e-hb19-1025-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1025vote65924d
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1025vote64e0e3
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1025vote595b27
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/157ea5a113c2ad148725839100787648-hb19-1025-4-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/157ea5a113c2ad148725839100787648-hb19-1025-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/157ea5a113c2ad148725839100787648-hb19-1025-3-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/157ea5a113c2ad148725839100787648-hb19-1025-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/a4ed3f21dba9113b872583c1007af4a7-hb19-1025-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/1a12abebd5961c55872583d7004b15d3-hb19-1025-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1025vote552b9f
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1025vote560a3c
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1025vote5728cf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/7b82f1a30843e13b872583a90052967e-hb19-1025-1-activity-vote-summary

Bill Comments

feedback