CO HB1022 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-5)
Status: Passed on April 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-12 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-5)
Status: Passed on April 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-12 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning modifications to the administration of the Colorado state fair and industrial exposition.
Title
Modify Administration Of Colorado State Fair
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-23 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - Senate - Senate Agriculture & Natural Resources: Refer House Bill 22-1022 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - Senate - Senate Agriculture & Natural Resources: Reconsider vote on amendment L.003 (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - Senate - Senate Agriculture & Natural Resources: Adopt amendment L.003 (Y: 1 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2022-03-17 - Senate - Senate Agriculture & Natural Resources: Refer House Bill 22-1022 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 61 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - House Agriculture, Livestock, & Water: Refer House Bill 22-1022 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - Senate - Senate Agriculture & Natural Resources: Refer House Bill 22-1022 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - Senate - Senate Agriculture & Natural Resources: Reconsider vote on amendment L.003 (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - Senate - Senate Agriculture & Natural Resources: Adopt amendment L.003 (Y: 1 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2022-03-17 - Senate - Senate Agriculture & Natural Resources: Refer House Bill 22-1022 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 61 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - House Agriculture, Livestock, & Water: Refer House Bill 22-1022 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-12 | Governor Signed | |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2022-04-04 | Sent to the Governor | |
2022-04-01 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Senate Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture & Natural Resources |
2022-03-01 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-02-24 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over to 03/01/2022 - No Amendments |
2022-02-23 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2022-02-22 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2022-02-08 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over to 02/22/2022 - No Amendments |
2022-02-07 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2022-02-03 | House | House Committee on Agriculture, Livestock, & Water Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2022-01-12 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Agriculture, Livestock, & Water |