CO HB1020 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-2)
Status: Passed on February 20 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-20 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-2)
Status: Passed on February 20 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-20 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the enactment of the Colorado Revised Statutes 2023 as the positive and statutory law of the state of Colorado.
Title
Enactment of CRS 2023
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer House Bill 24-1020 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-26 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 57 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-01-23 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 24-1020 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer House Bill 24-1020 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-26 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 57 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-01-23 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 24-1020 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-20 | Governor Signed | |
2024-02-15 | Sent to the Governor | |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2024-02-15 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary |
2024-01-26 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-01-25 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2024-01-23 | House | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2024-01-10 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary |