CO HB1020 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-29 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning civil forfeiture reform, and, in connection therewith, changing the entity required to report on forfeitures, expanding the scope of the forfeitures to be reported, establishing grant programs, changing the disbursement of net forfeiture proceeds, and making an appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Civil Forfeiture Reforms

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1020 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 18-1020 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-30 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 18-1020 to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-09 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 38 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-06 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.005 (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-06 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1020, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-06 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-12 - House - House Finance: Adopt amendment L.004 [Attachment C]. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-12 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 18-1020, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-06 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.003 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-06 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 18-1020, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 18-1020, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-29 Governor Signed
2018-05-16 Sent to the Governor
2018-05-16SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2018-05-15HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2018-05-04SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2018-05-03SenateSenate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
2018-05-03SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2018-05-02SenateSenate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2018-04-30SenateSenate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to Finance
2018-04-10SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs
2018-04-09HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2018-04-06HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
2018-04-06HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2018-02-12HouseHouse Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations
2018-02-06HouseHouse Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Finance
2018-01-10HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb18-1020
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_1020_01.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_1020_eng.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_1020_ren.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_1020_rev.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_1020_rer.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_1020_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hjud2018a2018-02-06t133231z-hb18-1020-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hfin2018a2018-02-12t133145z-hb18-1020-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hfin2018a2018-02-12t133145z-hb18-1020-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hjud2018a2018-02-06t133231z-hb18-1020-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hjud2018a2018-02-06t133231z-hb18-1020-3-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hjud2018a2018-02-06t133231z-hb18-1020-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/happ2018a2018-04-06t080503z-hb18-1020-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/happ2018a2018-04-06t080503z-hb18-1020-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/happ2018a2018-04-06t080503z-hb18-1020-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb18-1020vote5b960c
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/ssa2018a2018-04-30t143845z-hb18-1020-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/sfin2018a2018-05-02t134747z-hb18-1020-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/sapp2018a2018-05-03t083717z-hb18-1020-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb18-1020vote66b8eb

Bill Comments

feedback