CO HB1019 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-06 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning measures to manage the state prison population, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prison Population Reduction And Management

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-27 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 41 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 21 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.003 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-21 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 20-1019, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.045 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.036 (Attachment K) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.042 (Attachment L) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.041 (Attachment J) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer House Bill 20-1019, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer House Bill 20-1019, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 39 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.007) (Y: 21 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2020-02-04 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 20-1019, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.002 (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 20-1019, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment L). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-01-28 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment K). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-01-28 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment M). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-01-28 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment N). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-01-28 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 20-1019, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.006 (Attachment O). (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 20-1019, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-06 Governor Signed
2020-03-02 Sent to the Governor
2020-03-02SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2020-03-02HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2020-02-27SenateHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2020-02-26SenateHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
2020-02-24SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-02-21SenateSenate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
2020-02-21SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2020-02-12SenateSenate Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Appropriations
2020-02-10SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary + Appropriations
2020-02-06HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-02-05HouseHouse Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
2020-02-04HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2020-01-28HouseHouse Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Appropriations
2020-01-08HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary + Appropriations

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb20-1019
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1019_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1019_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1019_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1019_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1019_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1019_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/cae7abff4c451ad8872584fe00060820-hb20-1019-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/cae7abff4c451ad8872584fe00060820-hb20-1019-5-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/cae7abff4c451ad8872584fe00060820-hb20-1019-6-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/cae7abff4c451ad8872584fe00060820-hb20-1019-4-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/cae7abff4c451ad8872584fe00060820-hb20-1019-3-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/cae7abff4c451ad8872584fe00060820-hb20-1019-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/cae7abff4c451ad8872584fe00060820-hb20-1019-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/333681374fa202e587258504005fad39-hb20-1019-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/333681374fa202e587258504005fad39-hb20-1019-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/333681374fa202e587258504005fad39-hb20-1019-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb20-1019vote0f83f4
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb20-1019vote638fab
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/69ce1090302d25bf8725850c008319e5-hb20-1019-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/e93dca50ed2a549b87258515005740db-hb20-1019-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/e93dca50ed2a549b87258515005740db-hb20-1019-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/e93dca50ed2a549b87258515005740db-hb20-1019-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb20-1019vote625ece
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb20-1019vote5caad7
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb20-1019vote5c94a3
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/69ce1090302d25bf8725850c008319e5-hb20-1019-4-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/69ce1090302d25bf8725850c008319e5-hb20-1019-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/69ce1090302d25bf8725850c008319e5-hb20-1019-3-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/69ce1090302d25bf8725850c008319e5-hb20-1019-2-activity-vote-summary

Bill Comments

feedback