CO HB1017 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Enrolled on June 29 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-06-29 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning treatment of individuals with substance use disorders who come into contact with the criminal justice system.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Substance Use Disorder Treatment In Criminal Justice System

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 23 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 20-1017 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 40 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.010 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-06-08 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 20-1017, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment E). (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment A). (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Refer House Bill 20-1017, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Refer House Bill 20-1017, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-29 Sent to the Governor
2020-06-29SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2020-06-29HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2020-06-11SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-06-10SenateSenate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
2020-06-10SenateSenate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2020-06-09SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs
2020-06-09HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-06-08HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
2020-06-08HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2020-02-12HouseHouse Committee on Public Health Care & Human Services Refer Amended to Appropriations
2020-01-08HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Public Health Care & Human Services + Appropriations

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb20-1017
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1017_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1017_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1017_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1017_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1017_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1017_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/01d00bf7a673772f8725850c00650a86-hb20-1017-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/01d00bf7a673772f8725850c00650a86-hb20-1017-3-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/01d00bf7a673772f8725850c00650a86-hb20-1017-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/01d00bf7a673772f8725850c00650a86-hb20-1017-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/85e16fad6ed1a7c7872585810052c1d3-hb20-1017-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/85e16fad6ed1a7c7872585810052c1d3-hb20-1017-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb20-1017vote584a1e
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/50ea071c334fcf4a87258583005d4ed7-hb20-1017-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb20-1017vote603d53

Bill Comments

feedback