CO HB1014 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on February 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-28 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the retail food establishment inspection process, and, in connection therewith, detailing the process for the suspension of a retail food establishment's license or certification of license.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Retail Food Establishments Inspection And Suspension

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-28 Governor Signed
2019-02-21 Sent to the Governor
2019-02-21SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-02-20HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2019-02-15SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-02-14SenateSenate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-02-11SenateSenate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2019-01-29SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology
2019-01-28HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-01-25HouseHouse Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
2019-01-23HouseHouse Committee on Business Affairs & Labor Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2019-01-04HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs & Labor

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb19-1014
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1014_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1014_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1014_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1014_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1014_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1014_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/3d5ce89a877fc9398725838b0070aa9a-hb19-1014-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/3d5ce89a877fc9398725838b0070aa9a-hb19-1014-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1014vote65afe3
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/7ec54d2956c8404f8725839e0076e4e9-hb19-1014-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1014vote58f258

Bill Comments

feedback