CO HB1009 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-16 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-16 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Federal Funds Transparency Act
Title
Federal Funds Transparency Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-23 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-23 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-23 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-23 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-12 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 12-1009 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-12 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 12-1009 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-06 - House - FINAL VOTE - L.001 (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-06 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW as amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-06 - House - FINAL VOTE - Move conceptual amendment to add non-appropriation clause (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-06 - House - FINAL VOTE - L.001 (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-06 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW as amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-06 - House - FINAL VOTE - Move conceptual amendment to add non-appropriation clause (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-23 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-23 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-23 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-12 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 12-1009 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-12 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 12-1009 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-06 - House - FINAL VOTE - L.001 (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-06 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW as amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-06 - House - FINAL VOTE - Move conceptual amendment to add non-appropriation clause (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-06 - House - FINAL VOTE - L.001 (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-06 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW as amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-06 - House - FINAL VOTE - Move conceptual amendment to add non-appropriation clause (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-16 | Governor Action - Signed | |
2012-04-10 | Sent to the Governor | |
2012-03-29 | Senate Third Reading Passed | |
2012-03-28 | Senate Second Reading Passed | |
2012-03-27 | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2012-03-23 | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole | |
2012-03-12 | Senate Committee on State, Veterans & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to Appropriations | |
2012-02-20 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans & Military Affairs | |
2012-02-15 | House Third Reading Passed | |
2012-02-14 | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments | |
2012-02-08 | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily with Amendments | |
2012-02-06 | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole | |
2012-01-11 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Appropriations |