CO HB1008 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-12 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-12 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Allow CWRPDA Private Entity Forest Health Loans
Title
Allow CWRPDA Private Entity Forest Health Loans
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-20 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1008 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1008 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1008, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1008, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1008 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1008, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1008, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-12 | House | Governor Signed |
2014-04-30 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2014-04-29 | House | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2014-04-29 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Senate Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy |
2014-02-11 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-02-10 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2014-02-05 | House | House Committee on Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2014-02-03 | House | House Committee on Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources Witness Testimony and/or Committee Discussion Only |
2014-01-08 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources |