CO HB1007 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-12 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-12 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the establishment of contribution limits under the "Fair Campaign Practices Act" for candidates for county offices, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Contribution Limits For County Offices
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-22 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 19 N: 11 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1007 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 19-1007 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 40 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.004) (Y: 31 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-02-14 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.002) (Y: 23 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-02-12 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1007, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1007, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - House - House State, Veterans, and Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 19-1007, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - House - House State, Veterans, and Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 19-1007, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1007 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 19-1007 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 40 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.004) (Y: 31 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-02-14 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.002) (Y: 23 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-02-12 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1007, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1007, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - House - House State, Veterans, and Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 19-1007, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - House - House State, Veterans, and Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 19-1007, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-12 | Governor Signed | |
2019-04-03 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-04-02 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |
2019-02-15 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-02-14 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2019-02-12 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2019-01-15 | House | House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2019-01-04 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |