CO HB1007 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-28 - Senate Third Reading Laid Over to 5/8/2014 - No Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-28 - Senate Third Reading Laid Over to 5/8/2014 - No Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Prohib Ag Burning Fire Danger & Restrict Fireworks
Title
Prohib Ag Burning Fire Danger & Restrict Fireworks
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-11 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L008 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-11 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1007, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-11 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L008 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-11 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1007, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-06 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-06 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.004 (Y: 6 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-06 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1007, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-06 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-06 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.004 (Y: 6 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-06 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1007, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-11 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1007, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-11 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L008 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-11 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1007, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-06 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-06 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.004 (Y: 6 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-06 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1007, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-06 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-06 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.004 (Y: 6 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-06 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1007, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-28 | House | Senate Third Reading Laid Over to 5/8/2014 - No Amendments |
2014-03-21 | House | Senate Third Reading Laid Over to 03/28/2014 - No Amendments |
2014-03-18 | House | Senate Third Reading Laid Over to 03/21/2014 - No Amendments |
2014-03-17 | House | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Reconsidered - No Amendments |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over to 05/08/2014 - No Amendments |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Senate Committee on Local Government Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Local Government |
2014-02-14 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-02-13 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2014-02-11 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2014-02-06 | House | House Committee on Local Government Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2014-01-08 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Local Government |