CO HB1006 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 18 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-18 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 18 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-18 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Clarify Tax Exemptions For Housing Authorities
Title
Clarify Tax Exemptions For Housing Authorities
Sponsors
Rep. KC Becker [D] | Sen. Owen Hill [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-04-29 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-22 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1006 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-31 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1006, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-31 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt Amendment L.006 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-03-22 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-18 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1006, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-18 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.005 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2016-02-17 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1006, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-02-17 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-02-17 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1006, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-22 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1006 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-31 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1006, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-31 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt Amendment L.006 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-03-22 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-18 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1006, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-18 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.005 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2016-02-17 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1006, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-02-17 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-02-17 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1006, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-18 | House | Governor Signed |
2016-05-11 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2016-05-10 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2016-05-10 | House | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2016-04-29 | House | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2016-04-26 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2016-04-25 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2016-04-22 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance + Appropriations |
2016-03-22 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2016-03-21 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2016-03-18 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2016-02-17 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2016-01-13 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance |