CO HB1006 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-15 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-15 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
K-12 Breakfast After The Bell Nutrition Program
Title
K-12 Breakfast After The Bell Nutrition Program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-12 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW The motion passed on a vote of 4-3. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-12 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW The motion passed on a vote of 4-3. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-21 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1006 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-21 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1006 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-08 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1006, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-08 - House - FINAL VOTE - L.007 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-08 - House - FINAL VOTE - Postpone House Bill 13-1006 indefinitely (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-08 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1006, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-08 - House - FINAL VOTE - L.007 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-08 - House - FINAL VOTE - Postpone House Bill 13-1006 indefinitely (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-01-28 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt Amendment L.002 (Attachment F) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-01-28 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1006, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-28 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt Amendment L.002 (Attachment F) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-01-28 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1006, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-12 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW The motion passed on a vote of 4-3. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-21 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1006 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-21 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1006 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-08 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1006, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-08 - House - FINAL VOTE - L.007 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-08 - House - FINAL VOTE - Postpone House Bill 13-1006 indefinitely (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-08 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1006, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-08 - House - FINAL VOTE - L.007 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-08 - House - FINAL VOTE - Postpone House Bill 13-1006 indefinitely (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-01-28 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt Amendment L.002 (Attachment F) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-01-28 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1006, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-28 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt Amendment L.002 (Attachment F) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-01-28 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1006, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-15 | House | Governor Action - Signed |
2013-04-30 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2013-03-15 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services |
2013-03-14 | House | House Third Reading Passed |
2013-03-13 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-03-11 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily |
2013-03-08 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2013-01-28 | House | House Committee on Education Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2013-01-09 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Education + Appropriations |