CO HB1004 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-30 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-30 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Firefighter Motorcycle License Plate
Title
Firefighter Motorcycle License Plate
Sponsors
Rep. Max Tyler [D] | Sen. Nancy Todd [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-13 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1004 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1004 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-30 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1004, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-30 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.001 The motion passed on a vote of 13-0. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-30 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1004, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-30 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.001 The motion passed on a vote of 13-0. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-21 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1004 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-21 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1004 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1004 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-30 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1004, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-30 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.001 The motion passed on a vote of 13-0. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-30 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1004, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-30 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.001 The motion passed on a vote of 13-0. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-21 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1004 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-21 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1004 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-30 | House | Governor Signed |
2015-03-20 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2015-03-20 | House | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2015-03-20 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Senate Committee on Transportation Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2015-02-06 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Transportation |
2015-02-04 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2015-02-03 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2015-01-30 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2015-01-21 | House | House Committee on Transportation & Energy Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2015-01-07 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Energy |