CO HB1003 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-15 - House Second Reading Re-referred to Appropriations - No Amendments
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning community solar gardens.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Community Solar Gardens Modernization Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-28 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.005 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-28 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1003, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - House - House Energy & Environment: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment C). (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - House - House Energy & Environment: Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment D). (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - House - House Energy & Environment: Refer House Bill 19-1003, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - House - House Energy & Environment: Refer House Bill 19-1003, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-15HouseHouse Second Reading Re-referred to Appropriations - No Amendments
2019-03-14HouseHouse Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2019-03-11HouseHouse Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2019-02-28HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2019-01-17HouseHouse Committee on Energy & Environment Refer Amended to Appropriations
2019-01-04HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Energy & Environment

Subjects


Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb19-1003
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1003_01.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/ea461fbd717e461987258385005ba538-hb19-1003-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/ea461fbd717e461987258385005ba538-hb19-1003-3-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/ea461fbd717e461987258385005ba538-hb19-1003-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/ea461fbd717e461987258385005ba538-hb19-1003-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/dbbd6ebac900e92c872583af005299b3-hb19-1003-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/dbbd6ebac900e92c872583af005299b3-hb19-1003-0-activity-vote-summary

Bill Comments

feedback