CO HB1001 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-15 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Advanced Industries Acceleration Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Advanced Industries Acceleration Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-05-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - L.014 The motion passed on a vote of 4-3. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1001, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Reconsider motion to the COW so that motion incorporates both L.014 and J.003 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-05-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - J.003 The motion passed on a vote of 4-3. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - L.014 The motion passed on a vote of 4-3. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1001, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Reconsider motion to the COW so that motion incorporates both L.014 and J.003 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-05-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - J.003 The motion passed on a vote of 4-3. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-27 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1001 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-27 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1001 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-08 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1001 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-08 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1001 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-17 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.007 (Attachment I) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-01-17 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1001, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-17 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment H) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-01-17 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.007 (Attachment I) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-01-17 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment H) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-01-17 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1001, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-05-15HouseGovernor Action - Signed
2013-05-10HouseSent to the Governor
2013-05-08HouseHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2013-05-07SenateSenate Third Reading Passed
2013-05-06SenateSenate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments
2013-05-03SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2013-02-27SenateSenate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2013-02-14SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology + Appropriations
2013-02-12HouseHouse Third Reading Passed
2013-02-11HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments
2013-02-08HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2013-01-17HouseHouse Committee on Business, Labor, Economic, & Workforce Development Refer Amended to Appropriations
2013-01-09HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Business, Labor, Economic, & Workforce Development + Appropriations

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/24CD86949A5BF7A887257AEE00585EE6?Open
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/24CD86949A5BF7A887257AEE00585EE6/$FILE/1001_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/24CD86949A5BF7A887257AEE00585EE6/$FILE/1001bus_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/24CD86949A5BF7A887257AEE00585EE6/$FILE/1001_eng.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/24CD86949A5BF7A887257AEE00585EE6/$FILE/1001_ren.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/24CD86949A5BF7A887257AEE00585EE6/$FILE/1001sapp_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/24CD86949A5BF7A887257AEE00585EE6/$FILE/1001_rev.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/24CD86949A5BF7A887257AEE00585EE6/$FILE/1001_rer.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/24CD86949A5BF7A887257AEE00585EE6/$FILE/1001_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/7A8424E30243D95287257AF70001324B
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/F0B89CDADDF708D087257AF70000B08F
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/1AE1F2225D8622A187257AF70000EDF1
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/A89DF39CED03F26587257B1F0076FD4C
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/E527231676A272A787257B0C005D5C65
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/7CE0CCE99325A91387257B600053800C
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/59A67D38B129330C87257B6000535C02
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/28D59CA8FCF16E2887257B600053C51A
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/127DE96303D3018087257B60005321C1
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2013A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/F0B89CDADDF708D087257AF70000B08F
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2013A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/7A8424E30243D95287257AF70001324B
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2013A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/1AE1F2225D8622A187257AF70000EDF1
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2013A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/E527231676A272A787257B0C005D5C65
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2013A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/A89DF39CED03F26587257B1F0076FD4C
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2013A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/7CE0CCE99325A91387257B600053800C
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2013A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/59A67D38B129330C87257B6000535C02
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2013A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/28D59CA8FCF16E2887257B600053C51A
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2013A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/127DE96303D3018087257B60005321C1

Bill Comments

feedback