CA SR75 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-17 - Read. Adopted. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 5085.)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-17 - Read. Adopted. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 5085.)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to First Responder Day
Title
Relative to First Responder Day
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-17 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SR75 Morrell et al (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-17 | Senate | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 5085.) |
2018-05-07 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-05-03 | Senate | (Corrected May 10). |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2018-05-03 | Senate | From inactive file on motion of Senator Morrell. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file on request of Senator Morrell. |
2018-01-31 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |