CA SR73 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on February 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-05 - Read. Adopted. (Ayes 30. Noes 4. Page 4157.)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to a new 5-year National Offshore Oil and Gas Leasing Program on the Outer Continental Shelf

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to a new 5-year National Offshore Oil and Gas Leasing Program on the Outer Continental Shelf

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-05 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SR73 McGuire et al (Y: 30 N: 4 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-05SenateRead. Adopted. (Ayes 30. Noes 4. Page 4157.)
2018-01-29SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-01-25SenateOrdered to second reading.
2018-01-25Senate(Corrected January 29).
2018-01-25SenateRead third time and amended.
2018-01-24SenateFrom committee: Ordered to third reading.
2018-01-12SenateIntroduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback