CA SR59 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-05 - Read. Adopted. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2481.)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-05 - Read. Adopted. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2481.)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Latex Allergy Awareness Week
Title
Relative to Latex Allergy Awareness Week
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Dodd [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-09-05 - Senate - Special Consent SR59 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-05 | Senate | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2481.) |
2017-09-01 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2017-08-31 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. |
2017-08-30 | Senate | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |