CA SR39 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Introduced on May 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-07 - Reconsideration granted.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-07 - Reconsideration granted.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the 39th anniversary of Proposition 13.
Title
Relative to the 39th anniversary of Proposition 13.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-07 - Senate - [06-07-2017] hearing: Motion to Reconsider. [Reconsideration Granted.] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Senate - Be adopted. Ordered to third reading (Y: 2 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-06-07 - Senate - Be adopted. Ordered to third reading (Y: 2 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-07 | Senate | Reconsideration granted. |
2017-06-07 | Senate | June 7 hearing: Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 5. Page 1452.) |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Set for hearing June 7. |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |