CA SR16 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on August 12 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-09-06 - Read. Adopted. (Ayes 32. Noes 1. Page 2173.)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on August 12 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-09-06 - Read. Adopted. (Ayes 32. Noes 1. Page 2173.)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Section 215 of the USA PATRIOT Act
Title
Relative to Section 215 of the USA PATRIOT Act
Sponsors
Sen. Ted Lieu [D] | Sen. Joel Anderson [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-09-06 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SR16 Lieu (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-09-06 | Senate | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 32. Noes 1. Page 2173.) |
2013-08-30 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-08-29 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2013-08-22 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. |
2013-08-12 | Senate | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |