CA SR113 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Introduced on June 13 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-08-15 - Reconsideration granted.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 13 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-08-15 - Reconsideration granted.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the 40th anniversary of Proposition 13.
Title
Relative to the 40th anniversary of Proposition 13.
Sponsors
Sen. Ted Gaines [R] | Sen. Joel Anderson [R] | Sen. Patricia Bates [R] | Sen. Tom Berryhill [R] |
Sen. Anthony Cannella [R] | Sen. Jean Fuller [R] | Sen. John Moorlach [R] | Sen. Mike Morrell [R] |
Sen. Janet Nguyen [R] | Sen. Jim Nielsen [R] | Sen. Jeff Stone [R] | Sen. Andy Vidak [R] |
Sen. Scott Wilk [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-08-15 - Senate - [08-15-2018] hearing: Motion to Reconsider. [Reconsideration Granted.] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-15 - Senate - Be adopted. Ordered to third reading (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-08-15 - Senate - Be adopted. Ordered to third reading (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-15 | Senate | Reconsideration granted. |
2018-08-15 | Senate | August 15 hearing: Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 3. Page 5325.) |
2018-08-10 | Senate | Set for hearing August 15. |
2018-08-08 | Senate | August 8 hearing postponed by committee. |
2018-08-02 | Senate | Set for hearing August 8. |
2018-06-20 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2018-06-13 | Senate | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |