CA SJR8 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 42-3)
Status: Passed on September 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 146, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 42-3)
Status: Passed on September 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 146, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the California Nonmotorized Trails Master Plan.
Title
California Nonmotorized Trails Master Plan.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-08-31 - Assembly - SJR 8 Allen Senate Third Reading By GLORIA (Y: 53 N: 14 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-22 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-17 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SJR8 Allen et al (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-11 - Senate - Be adopted. Ordered to third reading (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-22 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-17 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SJR8 Allen et al (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-11 - Senate - Be adopted. Ordered to third reading (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-07 | Senate | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 146, Statutes of 2017. |
2017-09-07 | Senate | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 10 a.m. |
2017-09-01 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2017-08-31 | Assembly | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 53. Noes 14. Page 2848.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2017-08-31 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2017-08-22 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 8. Noes 4.) (August 22). |
2017-08-22 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2017-07-20 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on W.,P., & W. |
2017-07-17 | Assembly | In Assembly. Held at Desk. |
2017-07-17 | Senate | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 36. Noes 1. Page 2069.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2017-07-11 | Senate | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 1998.) (July 11). |
2017-07-03 | Senate | Set for hearing July 11. |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2017-06-20 | Senate | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |