CA SJR7 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 102, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the Merrill’s Marauders Congressional Gold Medal Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Military and veterans.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-24 - Assembly - SJR 7 Glazer Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SJR7 Glazer et al (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Be adopted. Ordered to third reading (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-28SenateChaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 102, Statutes of 2019.
2019-06-28SenateEnrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3 p.m.
2019-06-24SenateIn Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2019-06-24AssemblyRead. Adopted. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2402.) Ordered to the Senate.
2019-06-19AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 18).
2019-05-16AssemblyReferred to Com. on V.A.
2019-05-07AssemblyIn Assembly. Held at Desk.
2019-05-06SenateRead. Adopted. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 963.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2019-04-30SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-04-29SenateOrdered to second reading.
2019-04-29SenateRead third time and amended.
2019-04-10SenateFrom committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 625.) (April 9).
2019-03-29SenateSet for hearing April 9.
2019-03-27SenateRe-referred to Com. on V.A.
2019-03-20SenateIntroduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback