CA SJR5 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-0)
Status: Passed on September 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 142, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to California transportation infrastructure.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

California transportation infrastructure.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-09-03 - Senate - Unfinished Business SJR5 Beall et al. Concurrence (Y: 28 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-26 - Assembly - SJR 5 Beall Senate Third Reading By Frazier (Y: 49 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-01 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SJR5 Beall et al (Y: 28 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Be adopted. Ordered to third reading (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-09SenateChaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 142, Statutes of 2019.
2019-09-09Senate(Corrected September 5).
2019-09-09SenateEnrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3 p.m.
2019-09-03SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 28. Noes 11. Page 2436.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2019-08-26SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2019-08-26AssemblyRead. Adopted. (Ayes 49. Noes 24. Page 2847.) Ordered to the Senate.
2019-07-02AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (July 1).
2019-06-17AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
2019-05-16AssemblyReferred to Com. on TRANS.
2019-04-22AssemblyIn Assembly. Held at Desk.
2019-04-22SenateRead. Adopted. (Ayes 28. Noes 10. Page 745.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2019-04-10SenateFrom committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 3. Page 657.) (April 9).
2019-03-22SenateSet for hearing April 9.
2019-03-20SenateRe-referred to Com. on TRANS.
2019-03-13SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2019-03-07SenateIntroduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback