CA SJR5 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-22 - Set for hearing April 9.
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Hearing: Apr 9 @ 1:30 pm in John L. Burton Hearing Room
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to California transportation infrastructure.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

California transportation infrastructure.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-22SenateSet for hearing April 9.
2019-03-20SenateRe-referred to Com. on TRANS.
2019-03-13SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2019-03-07SenateIntroduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback