CA SJR5 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on September 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-22 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 187, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to federal rescheduling of marijuana from a Schedule I drug.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Federal rescheduling of marijuana from a Schedule I drug.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-09-14 - Assembly - SJR 5 Stone Senate Third Reading By CUNNINGHAM (Y: 60 N: 10 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-11 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SJR5 Stone et al (Y: 34 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Senate - Be adopted. Ordered to third reading (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-09-22SenateChaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 187, Statutes of 2017.
2017-09-22SenateEnrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 10:30 a.m.
2017-09-15SenateIn Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2017-09-14AssemblyRead. Adopted. (Ayes 60. Noes 10. Page 3398.) Ordered to the Senate.
2017-07-12AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 11).
2017-06-15AssemblyReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2017-04-06AssemblyIn Assembly. Held at Desk.
2017-04-06SenateRead. Adopted. (Ayes 34. Noes 2. Page 640.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2017-04-03SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-03-30SenateOrdered to second reading.
2017-03-30SenateRead third time and amended.
2017-03-22SenateFrom committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 430.) (March 21).
2017-03-07SenateSet for hearing March 21.
2017-03-02SenateRe-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2017-02-21SenateIntroduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback