CA SJR3 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Passed on July 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-19 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 62, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Passed on July 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-19 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 62, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to toxic substances control.
Title
Toxic substances: federal law.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-07-14 - Senate - Unfinished Business SJR3 Pavley (Y: 23 N: 14 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-07-05 - Assembly - SJR3 Pavley Senate Third Reading By FEUER (Y: 48 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-06-14 - Assembly - Be adopted (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-05 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SJR3 Pavley (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-02 - Senate - Be adopted (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-07-05 - Assembly - SJR3 Pavley Senate Third Reading By FEUER (Y: 48 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-06-14 - Assembly - Be adopted (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-05 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SJR3 Pavley (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-02 - Senate - Be adopted (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-19 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 62, Statutes of 2011. | |
2011-07-19 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11:15 a.m. | |
2011-07-14 | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 23. Noes 14. Page 1858.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | |
2011-07-05 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. | |
2011-07-05 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 48. Noes 28. Page 2188.) Ordered to the Senate. | |
2011-06-14 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (June 14). | |
2011-06-03 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. | |
2011-05-16 | Referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. | |
2011-05-05 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | |
2011-05-05 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 22. Noes 15. Page 875.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |
2011-05-03 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 857.) (May 2). | |
2011-04-07 | Re-referred to Com. on E.Q. | |
2011-03-15 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |