CA SJR22 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 7 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 135, Statutes of 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to horses.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Horses.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-08-25 - Senate - Unfinished Business SJR22 Florez (Y: 27 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-16 - Assembly - SJR 22 Florez Senate Third Reading By NAVA (Y: 55 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-30 - Assembly - Be adopted as amended (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-15 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SJR22 Florez (Y: 27 N: 7 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-16 - Senate - Be adopted (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-09-07 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 135, Statutes of 2010.
2010-09-07 Enrolled. To Secretary of State at 2 p.m.
2010-08-25 Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 27. Noes 7. Page 4880.) To enrollment.
2010-08-17 In Senate. To unfinished business.
2010-08-16 Read and adopted. (Ayes 55. Noes 16. Page 6241.) To Senate.
2010-08-02 Amended. Placed on third reading.
2010-07-06 From committee: Be adopted as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (Heard in committee on June 30.)
2010-04-19 To Com. on AGRI.
2010-04-15 In Assembly. Held at Desk.
2010-04-15 Read and adopted. (Ayes 27. Noes 7. Page 3198.) To Assembly.
2010-03-16 From committee: Be adopted. (Ayes 3. Noes 1. Page 2953.) To Third Reading.
2010-03-05 Set for hearing March 16.
2010-02-18 Re-referred to Com. on F. & A.
2010-02-10 Introduced. To Com. on RLS.

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=sjr_22&sess=0910&house=S
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sjr_22_bill_20100210_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sjr_22_bill_20100802_amended_asm_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sjr_22_bill_20100827_enrolled.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sjr_22_bill_20100907_chaptered.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sjr_22_vote_20100316_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sjr_22_vote_20100415_1001AM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sjr_22_vote_20100630_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sjr_22_vote_20100816_0227PM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sjr_22_vote_20100825_1249PM_sen_floor.html

Bill Comments

feedback