CA SJR22 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 7 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 135, Statutes of 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 7 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 135, Statutes of 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to horses.
Title
Horses.
Sponsors
Sen. Dean Florez [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-08-25 - Senate - Unfinished Business SJR22 Florez (Y: 27 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-16 - Assembly - SJR 22 Florez Senate Third Reading By NAVA (Y: 55 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-30 - Assembly - Be adopted as amended (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-15 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SJR22 Florez (Y: 27 N: 7 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-16 - Senate - Be adopted (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-16 - Assembly - SJR 22 Florez Senate Third Reading By NAVA (Y: 55 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-30 - Assembly - Be adopted as amended (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-15 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SJR22 Florez (Y: 27 N: 7 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-16 - Senate - Be adopted (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-09-07 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 135, Statutes of 2010. | |
2010-09-07 | Enrolled. To Secretary of State at 2 p.m. | |
2010-08-25 | Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 27. Noes 7. Page 4880.) To enrollment. | |
2010-08-17 | In Senate. To unfinished business. | |
2010-08-16 | Read and adopted. (Ayes 55. Noes 16. Page 6241.) To Senate. | |
2010-08-02 | Amended. Placed on third reading. | |
2010-07-06 | From committee: Be adopted as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (Heard in committee on June 30.) | |
2010-04-19 | To Com. on AGRI. | |
2010-04-15 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | |
2010-04-15 | Read and adopted. (Ayes 27. Noes 7. Page 3198.) To Assembly. | |
2010-03-16 | From committee: Be adopted. (Ayes 3. Noes 1. Page 2953.) To Third Reading. | |
2010-03-05 | Set for hearing March 16. | |
2010-02-18 | Re-referred to Com. on F. & A. | |
2010-02-10 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. |