CA SJR16 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 165, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 165, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to AmeriCorps.
Title
AmeriCorps.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-09-03 - Assembly - SJR 16 De Leon Senate Third Reading By BURKE (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-08-27 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-16 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SJR16 De Le (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-27 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-16 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SJR16 De Le (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-09-08 | Senate | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 165, Statutes of 2015. |
2015-09-08 | Senate | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 4:45 p.m. |
2015-09-03 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2015-09-03 | Assembly | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 2847.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2015-08-27 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (August 27). |
2015-08-27 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on A. & A.R. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. Joint Rule 62(a) suspended. |
2015-08-17 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2015-07-16 | Assembly | In Assembly. Held at Desk. |
2015-07-16 | Senate | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 1984.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2015-07-13 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. |
2015-07-09 | Senate | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |