CA SJR15 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-0)
Status: Passed on September 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-09-12 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 122, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-0)
Status: Passed on September 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-09-12 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 122, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the Postal Service Protection Act of 2013.
Title
Postal Service Protection Act of 2013.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-09-10 - Senate - Unfinished Business SJR15 Hancock Concurrence (Y: 27 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-09-09 - Assembly - SJR 15 Hancock Senate Third Reading By SKINNER (Y: 51 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-08-29 - Assembly - Be adopted as amended (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-08-15 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SJR15 Hancock (Y: 27 N: 9 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-09-09 - Assembly - SJR 15 Hancock Senate Third Reading By SKINNER (Y: 51 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-08-29 - Assembly - Be adopted as amended (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-08-15 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SJR15 Hancock (Y: 27 N: 9 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-09-12 | Senate | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 122, Statutes of 2013. |
2013-09-12 | Senate | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2 p.m. |
2013-09-10 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 27. Noes 10. Page 2296.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2013-09-09 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2013-09-09 | Assembly | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 51. Noes 25. Page 3026.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2013-09-04 | Assembly | Amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-09-03 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 3.) (August 29). |
2013-08-19 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on J., E.D., & E. |
2013-08-15 | Assembly | In Assembly. Held at Desk. |
2013-08-15 | Senate | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 27. Noes 9. Page 1856.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2013-08-14 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. |
2013-08-12 | Senate | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |