CA SJR13 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on September 1 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-12 - Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Calderon.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on September 1 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-12 - Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Calderon.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to white nationalist and neo-Nazi groups.
Title
White nationalist and neo-Nazi groups: prosecution.
Sponsors
Sen. Nancy Skinner [D] | Sen. Jim Beall [D] | Sen. Steven Bradford [D] | Sen. Cathleen Galgiani [D] |
Sen. Ricardo Lara [D] | Sen. Connie Leyva [D] | Sen. William Monning [D] | Sen. Henry Stern [D] |
Sen. Scott Wiener [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-09-11 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SJR13 Skinner et al (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-29 - Senate - Be adopted. Ordered to third reading (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SJR13 Skinner et al (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-29 - Senate - Be adopted. Ordered to third reading (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-12 | Assembly | Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Calderon. |
2017-09-11 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (September 11). |
2017-09-05 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2017-09-01 | Assembly | In Assembly. Held at Desk. |
2017-09-01 | Senate | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 37. Noes 0.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2017-08-29 | Senate | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 2274.) (August 29). |
2017-08-25 | Senate | Set for hearing August 29. |
2017-08-23 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2017-08-21 | Senate | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |