CA SJR13 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 50-2)
Status: Passed on September 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-09-20 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 132, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 50-2)
Status: Passed on September 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-09-20 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 132, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to immigration.
Title
Immigration reform: F3 and F4 visa categories.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-09-11 - Senate - Unfinished Business SJR13 Yee Concurrence (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-09-09 - Assembly - SJR 13 Yee Senate Third Reading By ALEJO (Y: 57 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2013-08-27 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-07-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SJR13 Yee (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-09-09 - Assembly - SJR 13 Yee Senate Third Reading By ALEJO (Y: 57 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2013-08-27 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-07-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SJR13 Yee (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-09-20 | Senate | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 132, Statutes of 2013. |
2013-09-20 | Senate | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 10:30 a.m. |
2013-09-11 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 30. Noes 1. Page 2365.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2013-09-10 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2013-09-09 | Assembly | Read. Amended. Adopted. (Ayes 57. Noes 7. Page 3003.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2013-08-27 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (August 27). |
2013-07-03 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2013-07-01 | Assembly | In Assembly. Held at Desk. |
2013-07-01 | Senate | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 29. Noes 1. Page 1604.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2013-06-11 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-06-10 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2013-05-29 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. |
2013-05-24 | Senate | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |