CA SJR11 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 59-1)
Status: Passed on August 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 157, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 59-1)
Status: Passed on August 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 157, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the Social Security 2100 Act: A Sacred Trust.
Title
The Social Security 2100 Act: A Sacred Trust.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-08-15 - Assembly - SJR 11 Skinner Senate Third Reading By Kalra (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2022-06-22 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-07 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SJR11 Skinner (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - Senate - Be adopted. Ordered to third reading (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-22 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-07 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SJR11 Skinner (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - Senate - Be adopted. Ordered to third reading (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 157, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-08-30 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 10:30 a.m. | |
2022-08-16 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2022-08-15 | Assembly | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 60. Noes 0. Page 5881.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2022-08-15 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2022-06-22 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 22). |
2022-04-21 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on P.E. & R. |
2022-04-07 | Assembly | In Assembly. Held at Desk. |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 29. Noes 0. Page 3357.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2022-03-22 | Senate | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 3169.) (March 21). |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Set for hearing March 21. |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |